Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1627 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Morrison (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1627
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 3, 2019, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 3, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the removal of certain counties from the Texas
 emissions reduction plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 386.001(2), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Affected county" includes:
 (A)  Bastrop County;
 (B)  Bexar County;
 (C)  Caldwell County;
 (D)  Comal County;
 (E)  Ellis County;
 (F)  Gregg County;
 (G)  Guadalupe County;
 (H)  Harrison County;
 (I)  Hays County;
 (J)  Henderson County;
 (K)  Hood County;
 (L)  Hunt County;
 (M)  Johnson County;
 (N)  Kaufman County;
 (O)  Nueces County;
 (P)  Parker County;
 (Q)  Rockwall County;
 (R)  Rusk County;
 (S)  San Patricio County;
 (T)  Smith County;
 (U)  Travis County;
 (V)  Upshur County;
 (W)  [Victoria County;
 [(X)]  Williamson County;
 (X) [(Y)]  Wilson County; and
 (Y) [(Z)]  any other county designated as an
 affected county by commission rule because of deteriorating air
 quality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *