Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1644 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/12/2019

                    86R7188 JTS-F
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 1644


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional
 mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 223.201(b), Transportation Code, is
 transferred to Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 redesignated as Section 223.2001, Transportation Code, and amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2001.  DEFINITION.  [(b)] In this subchapter,
 "comprehensive development agreement" means an agreement that, at a
 minimum, provides for the design and construction, reconstruction,
 rehabilitation, expansion, or improvement of a project described in
 Section 223.201(a) [Subsection (a)] and may also provide for the
 financing, acquisition, maintenance, or operation of a project
 described in that section [Subsection (a)].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 223.2002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2002.  LIMITATION. The department may enter into a
 comprehensive development agreement only:
 (1)  for specific projects authorized under this
 subchapter; or
 (2)  as provided by Subchapter F.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 223.201(f) and (g), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The department may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement [only] for all or part of[:
 [(1)]  the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project[;
 [(2)     the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project
 in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S.
 Highway 380;
 [(3)     the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant
 County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114;
 [(4)     the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in
 Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate
 Highway 35E;
 [(5)     the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67
 Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including:
 [(A)     Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to
 Interstate Highway 20; and
 [(B)     U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E
 to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road);
 [(6)     the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway
 59 to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County;
 [(7)     the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in
 Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99;
 [(8)     the Interstate Highway 820 project from State
 Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road;
 [(9)     the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County
 from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183;
 [(10)     the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State
 Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E;
 [(11)     the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties
 from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; and
 [(12)     the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in
 Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and
 Interstate Highway 37].
 (g)  The department may combine in a comprehensive
 development agreement under this subchapter:
 (1)  a toll project and a rail facility as defined by
 Section 91.001; or
 (2)  two or more projects for which the department is
 authorized under this subchapter to enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement [described by Subsection (f)].
 SECTION 4.  Section 223.2012(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, the North Tarrant Express project is
 the project on Interstate Highway 35W in Tarrant County from
 Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114 that was [described by
 Section 223.201(f)(3)] entered into on June 23, 2009.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 223.2014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2014.  AUTHORIZED PROJECTS. (a) The department
 may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for:
 (1)  the Interstate Highway 35 project in Travis and
 Williamson Counties from Ranch-to-Market Road 1431 to State Highway
 45 Southeast;
 (2)  the Interstate Highway 45 North project in Harris
 County from Beltway 8 to Interstate Highway 10;
 (3)  the Hempstead Managed Tollway project in Harris
 County from State Highway 99 to the Interstate Highway
 610/Interstate Highway 10 interchange;
 (4)  the Interstate Highway 30 project in Tarrant
 County from Interstate Highway 35W to east of Fielder Road;
 (5)  the Interstate Highway 635 East project in Dallas
 County from U.S. Highway 75 to Interstate Highway 30;
 (6)  the Interstate Highway 35E project in Dallas and
 Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S. Highway 380;
 and
 (7)  a project listed under Section 370.3051.
 (b)  This section expires August 31, 2029.
 SECTION 6.  Section 370.305(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  An authority may enter into a comprehensive development
 agreement only:
 (1)  for specific projects authorized under this
 subchapter; or
 (2)  as provided by Subchapter K [Except as provided by
 this chapter, an authority's authority to enter into a
 comprehensive development agreement expires on August 31, 2011].
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 370.3051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 370.3051.  AUTHORIZED PROJECTS FOR COMPREHENSIVE
 DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS. (a) A regional mobility authority may
 enter into a comprehensive development agreement for:
 (1)  the Interstate Highway 35 Northeast Expansion
 project, from Loop 410 South in Bexar County to Farm-to-Market Road
 1103 in Comal County;
 (2)  the Loop 1604 project in Bexar County;
 (3)  the Outer Parkway project in Cameron County from
 U.S. Highway 77 to Farm-to-Market Road 1847;
 (4)  the South Padre Island Second Access Causeway
 project in Cameron County from State Highway 100 to Park Road 100;
 (5)  the Farm-to-Market 1925 project from U.S. Highway
 281 in Hidalgo County to U.S. Highway 77 in Cameron County;
 (6)  the Hidalgo County Loop project;
 (7)  the International Bridge Trade Corridor project in
 Hidalgo County;
 (8)  the U.S. Highway 83 La Joya Relief Route project in
 Hidalgo County;
 (9)  the State Highway 68 project in Hidalgo County;
 (10)  the U.S. Highway 290 West project in Travis
 County from Loop 1 to Ranch-to-Market Road 1826 (Oak Hill Parkway);
 (11)  the Loop 1 South project in Travis County from
 Cesar Chavez Street to Slaughter Lane; and
 (12)  the Loop 49 project:
 (A)  in Smith County from Interstate Highway 20 to
 U.S. Highway 69 (Lindale Relief Route); and
 (B)  from State Highway 110 in Smith County to
 U.S. Highway 259 in Gregg County (Segments 6 and 7).
 (b)  This section expires August 31, 2029.
 SECTION 8.  The following provisions of the Transportation
 Code are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 223.201(i), (j), (k), (l), and (m); and
 (2)  Section 223.2011.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.