Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1665 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Patterson (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 1665
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 25, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain workers' compensation reporting requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 406.145(f), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (f)  If a subsequent hiring agreement is made to which the
 joint agreement does not apply, the hiring contractor and
 independent contractor shall notify in writing:
 (1)  [the division and] the hiring contractor's
 workers' compensation insurance carrier; and
 (2)  the division, on the division's request [in
 writing].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a notification required to be provided on or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *