Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1782 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/14/2019

                    86R4312 KKR-D
 By: Cortez H.B. No. 1782


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a plan to increase the use of telemedicine medical
 services and telehealth services in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.021611 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.021611.  ACTION PLAN TO EXPAND TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL
 SERVICES AND TELEHEALTH SERVICES. (a) The commission shall
 develop and implement an action plan to:
 (1)  expand the use of and increase access to
 telemedicine medical services, telehealth services, and related
 mobile applications for those services by health care providers for
 the residents of this state; and
 (2)  increase the availability of critical medical care
 and health care services to residents in this state in areas
 determined by the commission to be medically underserved, including
 the border region and rural areas.
 (b)  In developing and implementing the action plan under
 Subsection (a), the commission shall:
 (1)  seek the assistance of the Texas Hospital
 Association, the Texas Medical Association, teaching hospitals,
 and the statewide health coordinating council; and
 (2)  consult with health care providers, advocacy
 groups, relevant federal agencies, and any other interested persons
 the commission considers necessary to develop the action plan
 required by this section.
 (c)  The action plan developed under Subsection (a) must
 include:
 (1)   short-term and long-term plan recommendations,
 including policy initiatives and reforms necessary to implement the
 plan;
 (2)  statutory and administrative reforms necessary to
 implement the plan; and
 (3)  options for the funding necessary to implement the
 plan.
 (d)  The commission shall:
 (1)  not later than September 1, 2021:
 (A)  submit to the governor and the legislature
 the recommendations, the statutory and administrative reforms, and
 the funding options described in Subsection (c) and short-term and
 long-term plans to implement those recommendations, reforms, and
 options; and
 (B)  begin implementing the short-term plan;
 (2)  not later than September 1, 2023, fully implement
 the short-term plan;
 (3)  not later than September 1, 2029, fully implement
 the long-term plan; and
 (4)  include the short-term and long-term plans in the
 update of the strategic plan for health and human services under
 Section 531.022, Government Code.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2030.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.