Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1782 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Cortez, Guillen, Fierro H.B. No. 1782


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a plan to increase the use of telemedicine medical
 services, telehealth services, and interprofessional Internet
 consultations in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.021611 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.021611.  ACTION PLAN TO EXPAND TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL
 SERVICES AND TELEHEALTH SERVICES. (a) The commission shall
 develop and implement an action plan to:
 (1)  expand the use of and increase access to
 telemedicine medical services, telehealth services, and related
 mobile applications for those services by health care providers for
 the residents of this state; and
 (2)  increase the availability of critical medical care
 and health care services to residents in this state in areas
 determined by the commission to be medically underserved.
 (b)  In developing and implementing the action plan under
 Subsection (a), the commission shall:
 (1)  evaluate, in collaboration with the Maternal
 Mortality and Morbidity Task Force established under Chapter 34,
 Health and Safety Code, and other interested persons, the use of
 telemedicine medical services for women during pregnancy and the
 postpartum period;
 (2)  seek the assistance of the Texas Hospital
 Association, the Texas Medical Association, the Texas Nurses
 Association, The University of Texas System Virtual Health Network,
 teaching hospitals, and the statewide health coordinating council;
 and
 (3)  consult with health care providers, advocacy
 groups, relevant federal agencies, and any other interested persons
 the commission considers necessary to develop the action plan
 required by this section.
 (c)  The action plan developed under Subsection (a) must
 include:
 (1)   short-term and long-term plan recommendations,
 including policy initiatives and reforms necessary to implement the
 plan;
 (2)  statutory and administrative reforms necessary to
 implement the plan; and
 (3)  options for the funding necessary to implement the
 plan.
 (d)  The commission shall:
 (1)  not later than September 1, 2021:
 (A)  submit to the governor and the legislature
 the recommendations, the statutory and administrative reforms, and
 the funding options described in Subsection (c) and short-term and
 long-term plans to implement those recommendations, reforms, and
 options; and
 (B)  begin implementing the short-term plan;
 (2)  not later than September 1, 2023, fully implement
 the short-term plan;
 (3)  not later than September 1, 2029, fully implement
 the long-term plan; and
 (4)  include the short-term and long-term plans in the
 update of the strategic plan for health and human services under
 Section 531.022.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2030.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02166 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02166.  INTERPROFESSIONAL INTERNET CONSULTATIONS
 PILOT PROGRAM.  (a)  Not later than September 1, 2021, and subject
 to Subsection (e), the commission shall develop and implement a
 pilot program through which the commission provides or contracts
 with a third party to provide technical assistance to train
 Medicaid providers regarding the use of interprofessional Internet
 consultations for Medicaid recipients in rural and medically
 underserved areas.  The program must be designed to determine
 whether the use of technology improves access to specialty care,
 including pediatric, prenatal, postnatal, and behavioral health
 services, for Medicaid recipients.
 (b)  The commission shall:
 (1)  implement the pilot program in:
 (A)  at least one:
 (i)  federally qualified health center;
 (ii)  municipal public health system;
 (iii)  clinic that is a member of a nonprofit
 membership association that supports charitable clinics in this
 state; and
 (iv)  rural community center; and
 (B)  a maximum of 20 health clinics; and
 (2)  ensure that a third party contracted to provide
 technical assistance described under Subsection (a):
 (A)  has significant experience integrating
 telehealth services, telemedicine medical services, and online
 consultations with electronic health records; and
 (B)  has a current contract with the United States
 Department of Health and Human Services Health Resources and
 Services Administration as a regional telehealth resource center.
 (c)  The commission shall examine cost avoidance that
 results from providing telemedicine medical services to Medicaid
 recipients in rural and medically underserved communities through
 the pilot program, including cost avoidance that results from:
 (1)  reducing recipient wait times for specialty care
 providers;
 (2)  improving access to specialty care;
 (3)  reducing the number of recipient referrals; and
 (4)  reducing the number of miles traveled by
 recipients for specialty care consultations.
 (d)  Not later than December 31, 2022, the commission shall
 report to the legislature regarding the status and results of the
 pilot program and make recommendations regarding whether to
 continue, expand, or terminate the program.
 (e)  The commission is required to implement this section
 only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
 purpose.  If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the commission may, but is not
 required to, implement this section using other appropriations
 available for that purpose.
 (f)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.