Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1872 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: Goldman (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1872
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2019;
 April 9, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public access to certain information included on
 personal financial statements filed by county judicial officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 159.055, Local Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 159.055.  PUBLIC ACCESS TO STATEMENTS AND RELATED
 RECORDS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 159.055(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The [On the written request of a county judicial officer
 or candidate, the] county clerk or the commission shall remove the
 officer's or candidate's home address and the names of the officer's
 or candidate's dependent children from the officer's or candidate's
 financial statement and any county or commission record derived
 from the financial statement before the statement or record is made
 available to a member of the public.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 159.055(b), Local Government Code, applies to information included
 in a financial statement regardless of whether the statement was
 filed before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *