Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1940 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/02/2019

                    By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1940
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 2, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility of surplus lines insurers to provide
 windstorm and hail coverage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 981.004, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(1), the availability of
 windstorm and hail insurance from the Texas Windstorm Insurance
 Association does not preclude an eligible surplus lines insurer
 from providing windstorm and hail insurance under Subsection (a) or
 limiting the amount of insurance that may be provided under
 Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *