Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1969 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2019

                    By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1969
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the portion of State Highway 7 in
 Nacogdoches County as the Bataan and Corregidor Veterans Memorial
 Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  BATAAN AND CORREGIDOR VETERANS MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a) The portion of State Highway 7 in Nacogdoches County
 is designated as the Bataan and Corregidor Veterans Memorial
 Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Bataan and Corregidor Veterans Memorial Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *