Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1996 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: Leman (Senate Sponsor - Huffman, Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1996
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to admonitions given by a court to a defendant before
 accepting a plea of guilty or nolo contendere.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 26.13, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
 read as follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (d-1), the [The] court
 may make the admonitions required by this article either orally or
 in writing. If the court makes the admonitions in writing, it must
 receive a statement signed by the defendant and the defendant's
 attorney that the defendant [he] understands the admonitions and is
 aware of the consequences of the [his] plea. If the defendant is
 unable or refuses to sign the statement, the court shall make the
 admonitions orally.
 (d-1)  The court shall make the admonition required by
 Subsection (a)(4) both orally and in writing. Unless the court has
 received the statement as described by Subsection (d), the court
 must receive a statement signed by the defendant and the
 defendant's attorney that the defendant understands the admonition
 required by Subsection (a)(4) and is aware of the consequences of
 the plea. If the defendant is unable or refuses to sign the
 statement, the court shall make a record of that fact.
 SECTION 2.  Article 26.13, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a plea of guilty or a plea of
 nolo contendere accepted by a court on or after September 1, 2019,
 regardless of whether the offense for which the plea was submitted
 was committed before, on, or after that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *