Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2039 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2019

                    By: Shine, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 2039
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to Master Army
 Aviators.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.202(e-1), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Other than license plates issued under Subsection
 (h), license plates issued under this section may include, on
 request:
 (1)  the emblem of the veteran's branch of service; or
 (2)  one emblem from another license plate to which the
 person is entitled under Section 504.308, 504.309, 504.311,
 504.312, 504.313, 504.3135, 504.314, 504.315, 504.316, 504.3161,
 504.318, 504.319, 504.320, [or] 504.323, or 504.325.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.325 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.325.  MASTER ARMY AVIATOR. The department shall
 issue specialty license plates for persons awarded the Master Army
 Aviator Badge. The license plates must include:
 (1)  the words "Master Army Aviator"; and
 (2)  a depiction of the Master Army Aviator Badge.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *