Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2075 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: Neave, Swanson, Bucy H.B. No. 2075
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the form of a candidate's name on a ballot.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 52.031, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A person may use any surname acquired by law or
 marriage.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *