Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2092 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2092
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a personal identification certificate
 to a person whose driver's license has been surrendered.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.101, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (m)  The department shall adopt procedures for the issuance
 of a personal identification certificate to a person who surrenders
 the person's driver's license at the time of applying for the
 certificate.  The procedures:
 (1)  must be in compliance with federal guidelines
 governing the issuance of identification documents;
 (2)  may require the person issued a personal
 identification certificate to update information previously
 provided to the department under Section 521.142; and
 (3)  except as provided by Subdivision (2), may not
 require a person to provide additional identification documents
 unless required for compliance with federal guidelines described by
 Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *