Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2107 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2019

                    By: Capriglione, et al. H.B. No. 2107
 (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information provided by a local health jurisdiction on
 food regulation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter H, Chapter 438, Health
 and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H.  INFORMATION ON DEPARTMENT OR LOCAL HEALTH
 JURISDICTION FOOD REGULATION
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 438, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 438.151 to read as follows:
 Sec. 438.151.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "local
 health jurisdiction" means a public health district, county, or
 municipality that regulates food service establishments, retail
 food stores, mobile food units, temporary food service
 establishments, or roadside food vendors.
 SECTION 3.  Section 438.152, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 438.152.  REQUEST FOR INFORMATION.  Unless otherwise
 prohibited by state or federal law, on receipt of a written request
 for information pertaining to the regulation of food under this
 subtitle, the department or a local health jurisdiction shall
 provide a reasonable and substantial response to the request not
 later than the 30th day after the date the department or local
 health jurisdiction receives the request.
 SECTION 4.  Section 438.153, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 438.153.  REQUEST FOR OFFICIAL DETERMINATION. (a)  On
 receipt of a written request regarding the applicability to a
 specific circumstance of a regulation or the requirements for
 compliance with the regulation, the department or local health
 jurisdiction shall provide an official written determination
 regarding the applicability of the regulation or the requirements
 for compliance with the regulation to the requestor not later than
 the 30th day after the date the department or local health
 jurisdiction receives the request.
 (b)  An official determination made under this section is
 valid until the regulation that is the subject of the determination
 is amended by statute, [or] department rule, or local health
 jurisdiction regulation.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for information or official determination made under
 Subchapter H, Chapter 438, Health and Safety Code, as amended by
 this Act, to a local health jurisdiction on or after January 1,
 2020. A request for information or official determination made to a
 local health jurisdiction before January 1, 2020, is governed by
 the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *