Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2127 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Harris, Bailes, Cain H.B. No. 2127
 (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 3, 2019, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensure and registration of persons engaged in
 certain activities pertaining to compressed natural gas or
 liquefied natural gas containers and systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 116.031, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Unless otherwise provided in this chapter or by
 commission rule, a person shall be required to obtain a license from
 the commission to engage in any of the following activities:
 (1)  work that includes the [manufacture,] assembly,
 repair, testing, sale, installation, or subframing of CNG cylinders
 or LNG containers for use in this state;
 (2)  systems work that includes the [sale,]
 installation, modification, or servicing of CNG or LNG systems for
 use in this state, including the installation, modification, or
 servicing by any person, except a political subdivision, of a CNG or
 LNG motor fuel system or mobile fuel system on a vehicle used in the
 transportation of the general public; or
 (3)  product work that includes the sale, storage,
 transportation for delivery, or dispensing of CNG or LNG in this
 state.
 (e)  The commission shall adopt rules providing for the
 registration of persons engaged in the manufacture of CNG cylinders
 or LNG containers for use in this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *