Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2164 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Burns, Holland (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2164
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2164 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to imposing a civil penalty for prohibiting or otherwise
 restricting a peace officer or special investigator from carrying a
 weapon on certain premises open to the public.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 2.1305, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  An establishment serving the public that violates this
 article is subject to a civil penalty in the amount of $1,000 for
 each violation. The attorney general may sue to collect a civil
 penalty under this subsection. Money collected under this
 subsection shall be deposited in the state treasury to the credit of
 the general revenue fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *