Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2176 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Leman (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2176
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 10, 2019, rereferred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Lavaca Hospital District to lease
 district property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1051.107, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection
 (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  The board may lease all or part of the district's land,
 buildings, and [other] facilities on terms considered to be in the
 best interest of the district's inhabitants. The term of the lease
 may not exceed 50 [25] years.
 (b-1)  A lease of the district's land to a private entity
 under Subsection (b) must include a provision that requires the
 lessee to indemnify the district for and exempt the district from
 any liability resulting from an act or omission of the lessee.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1051.107(b-1), Special District Local
 Laws Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a contract entered
 into on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *