Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2199 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Flores, Lucio) H.B. No. 2199
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2199 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.1066(a), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a municipality with a population of at least 3,500
 but less than 5,500 that is the county seat of a county with a
 population of less than 50,000 that borders a county with a
 population of more than 1.6 million;
 (2)  a municipality with a population of at least 2,900
 but less than 3,500 that is the county seat of a county with a
 population of less than 22,000 that is bordered by the Trinity River
 and includes a state park and a portion of a wildlife management
 area;
 (3)  a municipality with a population of at least 7,500
 that is located in a county that borders the Pecos River and that
 has a population of not more than 15,000;
 (4)  a municipality with a population of not more than
 5,000 that is located in a county through which the Frio River flows
 and an interstate highway crosses, and that has a population of at
 least 15,000; [and]
 (5)  a municipality with a population of not less than
 7,500 that is located in a county with a population of not less than
 40,000 but less than 250,000 that is adjacent to a county with a
 population of less than 750;
 (6)  a municipality that is the county seat of a county
 with a population of at least 8,500 and that county contains part of
 the Chaparral Wildlife Management Area; and
 (7)  a municipality that has a population of not more
 than 25,000, that contains a cultural heritage museum, and that is
 located in a county that borders the United Mexican States and the
 Gulf of Mexico.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *