By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2214 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019; May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border Security; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a report by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation concerning license applicants who are military service members, military veterans, or military spouses. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 51.40135 to read as follows: Sec. 51.40135. REPORT CONCERNING LICENSE APPLICANTS WHO ARE MILITARY SERVICE MEMBERS, MILITARY VETERANS, OR MILITARY SPOUSES. (a) In this section, "military service member," "military veteran," and "military spouse" have the meanings assigned by Section 55.001. (b) The department shall review each type of license issued by the department to an individual to identify the types for which a significant number of military service members, military veterans, or military spouses submit applications. (c) Not later than December 1, 2020, the department shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over the department a report on the results of the review and any recommendations related to the efficient issuance of licenses to qualified military service members, military veterans, and military spouses. (d) The department shall make the report available on the department's Internet website. (e) This section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *