Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2218 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2218
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2218 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating a Class C menhaden boat license; imposing a
 fee; requiring a license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 47.008, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (d) and adding Subsection
 (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  A boat may not be used for the purpose of catching,
 storing, and transporting menhaden in tidal water unless the owner
 of the boat has acquired:
 (1)  a Class A menhaden boat license; or
 (2)  a Class C menhaden boat license.
 (a-1)  The holder of a Class C menhaden boat license may not
 take or harvest from the public water of the state more than 300
 pounds a day of menhaden or an amount set by the department.
 (d)  The commission shall set the license fee for each [Class
 B] menhaden boat for each yearly period:
 (1)  in an amount not less than $2,000 for a Class A
 menhaden boat license;
 (2)  in an amount not to exceed $50 for a Class B
 menhaden boat license; and
 (3)  at $420 for a Class C menhaden boat license.
 SECTION 2.  Section 47.038, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), nets [Nets] or
 purse seines used for catching menhaden may not be:
 (1)  less than one and one-half inch stretched mesh,
 excluding the bag;
 (2)  used in any bay, river, pass, or tributary, nor
 within one mile of any barrier, jetty, island, or pass, nor within
 one-half mile offshore in the Gulf of Mexico; or
 (3)  used for the purpose of taking edible aquatic
 products for the purpose of barter, sale, or exchange.
 (a-1)  The holder of a Class C menhaden boat license issued
 under Section 47.008 may use a cast net, as defined by the
 commission, to catch menhaden in any coastal bay, river, or
 tributary landward from the shoreline of the state along the coast
 of the Gulf of Mexico.
 SECTION 3.  Section 47.008(c), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *