Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2223 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2223
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019;
 April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture; April 23, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption of certain commercial weighing or
 measuring devices from registration and inspection requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.1002, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 13.1002.  EXEMPTION OF CERTAIN WEIGHING OR MEASURING
 DEVICES. Notwithstanding any other law, a commercial weighing or
 measuring device [that is exclusively used to weigh food sold for
 immediate consumption] is exempt from this subchapter, including
 the inspection requirements under Section 13.101 and the
 registration requirements under Section 13.1011, if the device is
 exclusively used to weigh food:
 (1)  sold ready for immediate consumption, regardless
 of whether the food is consumed on the premises where the food is
 weighed and sold; and
 (2)  not exempted from sales and use taxes under
 Section 151.314, Tax Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *