Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2228 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/02/2019

                    By: Geren, Cain (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2228
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 2, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inspection of certain boilers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 755.026, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  With the approval of the executive director and the
 inspection agency that has jurisdiction for the power boiler, the
 interval between internal inspections may be extended to a period
 not exceeding a total of 60 months. For unfired steam boilers or
 steam collection or liberation drums of process steam generators,
 the inspection interval may be extended to the next scheduled
 downtime of the boiler, but not exceeding a total of:
 (1)  84 months for unfired steam boilers; [or]
 (2)  120 months for steam collection or liberation
 drums of process steam generators manufactured before January 1,
 1970; or
 (3)  144 months for steam collection or liberation
 drums of process steam generators manufactured on or after January
 1, 1970.
 (c-1)  The executive director and the inspection agency on
 request may grant an extension for a period not to exceed 24 months
 in addition to the extension authorized under Subsection (a)(2).
 The request must include a report issued by an engineer licensed by
 the Texas Board of Professional Engineers certifying:
 (1)  completion in accordance with industry standards
 of a quantitative engineering assessment for in-service equipment,
 repairs, and alterations prescribed by the National Board
 Inspection Code NB23; and
 (2)  based on the assessment, the steam collection or
 liberation drums of the process steam generator are safe to
 operate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *