Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2290 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Buckley, Bailes, Leman H.B. No. 2290
 (Senate Sponsor - Flores)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the placement of a slow-moving-vehicle emblem.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 547.703(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), a slow-moving
 vehicle shall display a slow-moving-vehicle emblem that:
 (1)  has a reflective surface designed to be clearly
 visible in daylight or at night from the light of standard
 automobile headlamps at a distance of at least 500 feet;
 (2)  is mounted base down on the rear of the vehicle and
 at a height that does not impair the visibility of the emblem [from
 three to five feet above the road surface]; and
 (3)  is maintained in a clean, reflective condition.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense was
 committed before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *