Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB23 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Lambert (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 23
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of State Highway Loop 322 in Taylor
 County as the Officer Rodney T. Holder Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  OFFICER RODNEY T. HOLDER MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  State Highway Loop 322 in Taylor County between its
 intersection with U.S. Highway 84 and its intersection with
 Interstate Highway 20 is designated as the Officer Rodney T. Holder
 Memorial Highway. The designation is in addition to any other
 designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 highway number, the designation as the Officer Rodney T. Holder
 Memorial Highway, and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *