Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2310 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2019

                    By: Vo, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 2310
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the information necessary to appropriately title
 certain flood damaged vehicles that have been repaired with federal
 financial assistance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 501.09112, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  The department and the Texas Division of Emergency
 Management shall coordinate with the Federal Emergency Management
 Agency to ensure that the department has information, including a
 vehicle identification number, necessary to apply the notation
 under Subsection (d) to the title of a vehicle:
 (1)  to which that subsection applies; and
 (2)  that has been repaired or salvaged using financial
 assistance designated for that purpose and administered by the
 Federal Emergency Management Agency.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *