Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2324 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2019

                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2324
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of a health care provider
 participation program by the Tarrant County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 298B.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 298B.004.  EXPIRATION OF AUTHORITY. (a) Subject to
 Sections 298B.153(d) and 298B.154, the authority of the district to
 administer and operate a program under this chapter expires
 December 31, 2025 [2019].
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not affect the authority of the
 district to require and collect a mandatory payment under Section
 298B.154 after December 31, 2025 [2019], if necessary.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *