By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2324 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019; April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the continuation of a health care provider participation program by the Tarrant County Hospital District. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 298B.004, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 298B.004. EXPIRATION OF AUTHORITY. (a) Subject to Sections 298B.153(d) and 298B.154, the authority of the district to administer and operate a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2025 [2019]. (b) Subsection (a) does not affect the authority of the district to require and collect a mandatory payment under Section 298B.154 after December 31, 2025 [2019], if necessary. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *