By: Metcalf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2325 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; May 10, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2325 By: Hancock A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to information and communication of governmental and other entities regarding disasters and health and human services. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, 418.056, 418.057, 418.058, and 418.059 to read as follows: Sec. 418.054. COORDINATING 9-1-1 TEXT MESSAGE CAPABILITY. The division, in consultation with the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service, shall coordinate state and local government efforts to make 9-1-1 emergency service capable of receiving text messages from a cellular telephone or other wireless communication device. Sec. 418.055. SOCIAL MEDIA USE DURING AND AFTER DISASTERS. The division, in consultation with any state agency or private entity the division determines is appropriate, shall develop standards for the use of social media as a communication tool by governmental entities during and after a disaster. The standards must: (1) require state agencies, political subdivisions, first responders, and volunteers that use social media during and after a disaster to post consistent and clear information; (2) optimize the effectiveness of social media use during and after a disaster; and (3) require that certain official social media accounts be used during and after a disaster only for providing credible sources of information. Sec. 418.056. DISASTER MOBILE APPLICATION. (a) The division shall develop a mobile application for wireless communication devices to communicate critical information during a disaster directly to disaster victims and first responders. (b) The mobile application may provide information on: (1) road and weather conditions during a disaster; and (2) disaster response and recovery activities. Sec. 418.057. DISASTER WEB PORTAL. The division shall develop a comprehensive disaster web portal. The web portal must: (1) provide disaster information to the public, including information on programs and services available to disaster victims and funding for and expenditures of disaster assistance programs; (2) include information on disaster response and recovery activities; and (3) provide information on obtaining assistance from the Federal Emergency Management Agency, state agencies, organized volunteer groups, and any other entities providing disaster assistance. Sec. 418.058. USE OF DATA ANALYTICS IN DISASTER MANAGEMENT. To the extent feasible, the division shall use data analytics software to integrate data from federal, state, local, and nongovernmental sources to more effectively manage disaster response and recovery. Sec. 418.059. STUDY ON STANDARD COMMUNICATION FORMAT. (a) To improve the state's response to disasters, the division shall conduct a study on the use of a standard communication format by first responders to create a common interoperable operating framework during a disaster. The study must: (1) examine the costs and benefits of promoting the use of a standard communication format to create a comprehensive common operating framework that is interoperable across networks; (2) identify any costs that first responders may incur in acquiring or upgrading equipment or services complying with a standard communication format; and (3) identify necessary actions to adopt a standard communication format. (b) Not later than September 1, 2020, the division shall submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, and members of the legislature a report on the findings of the study. (c) This section expires December 1, 2020. SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 418.127 to read as follows: Sec. 418.127. DISASTER PREPAREDNESS COMMUNITY OUTREACH. To the extent practicable, the following entities shall conduct community outreach, including public awareness campaigns, and education activities on disaster preparedness each year: (1) municipalities and counties; (2) the department, including the division; (3) the Texas Education Agency; (4) the office of the comptroller; (5) the Texas Department of Insurance; (6) the Texas Department of Transportation; (7) the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs; (8) the Health and Human Services Commission; and (9) the Department of State Health Services. SECTION 3. Subchapter H, Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by adding Sections 418.193 and 418.194 to read as follows: Sec. 418.193. PURCHASE OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY COMMODITY ITEMS FOR DISASTER PURPOSES. A public safety entity, as defined by 47 U.S.C. Section 1401, or a county hospital, public hospital, or hospital district may purchase commodity items through the Department of Information Resources in accordance with Section 2157.068 if the public safety entity, hospital, or hospital district finds that the purchase of those commodity items will assist the public safety entity, hospital, or hospital district in providing disaster education or preparing for a disaster. Sec. 418.194. CONTRACTS WITH CERTAIN ENTITIES FOR DISASTER PURPOSES. (a) In this section, "consolidated telecommunications system" has the meaning assigned by Section 2170.001(a). (b) A public safety entity, as defined by 47 U.S.C. Section 1401, or a governmental entity of another state may contract with the Department of Information Resources for use of the consolidated telecommunications system in accordance with Section 2170.004 if the public safety entity or governmental entity finds that the use of the consolidated telecommunications system will assist the entity in providing disaster education or preparing for a disaster. SECTION 4. Section 531.0312(a), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The Texas Information and Referral Network at the commission is the program responsible for the development, coordination, and implementation of a statewide information and referral network that integrates existing community-based structures with state and local agencies. The network must: (1) include information relating to transportation services provided to clients of state and local agencies; (2) be capable of assisting with statewide disaster response and emergency management, including through the use of interstate agreements with out-of-state call centers to ensure preparedness and responsiveness; (3) include technology capable of communicating with clients of state and local agencies using electronic text messaging; and (4) include a publicly accessible Internet-based system to provide real-time, searchable data about the location and number of clients of state and local agencies using the system and the types of requests made by the clients. SECTION 5. Section 2157.068(j), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (j) The following entities may purchase commodity items through the department, and be charged a reasonable administrative fee, as provided by this section: (1) the Electric Reliability Council of Texas; (2) the Lower Colorado River Authority; (3) a private school, as defined by Section 5.001, Education Code; (4) a private or independent institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code; [or] (5) a volunteer fire department, as defined by Section 152.001, Tax Code; (6) subject to Section 418.193, a public safety entity, as defined by 47 U.S.C. Section 1401; or (7) subject to Section 418.193, a county hospital, public hospital, or hospital district. SECTION 6. Section 2170.004, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 2170.004. CONTRACTS WITH ENTITIES OTHER THAN STATE AGENCIES. The department may contract for use of the consolidated telecommunications system with: (1) each house of the legislature; (2) a legislative agency; (3) an agency that is not a state agency as defined by Section 2151.002; (4) a political subdivision, including a county, municipality, or district; (5) a private institution of higher education accredited by a recognized accrediting agency, as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, that: (A) engages in distance learning, as defined by Section 57.021, Utilities Code; and (B) receives federal funds for distance learning initiatives; [and] (6) an assistance organization, as defined by Section 2175.001; (7) subject to Section 418.194, a public safety entity, as defined by 47 U.S.C. Section 1401; and (8) subject to Section 418.194, a governmental entity of another state. SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *