Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2326 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Meyer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2326
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of a health care provider
 participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 298A.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 298A.004.  EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section
 298A.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and
 operate a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2025
 [2019].
 (b)  This chapter expires December 31, 2025 [2019].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *