By: Walle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2330 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study of an intake system and state case management system for state and federal disaster assistance. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) In this section: (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services Commission. (2) "Division" means the Texas Division of Emergency Management. (b) The commission and the division shall conduct a study to determine the feasibility of developing: (1) a single intake form that would compile all information needed to obtain disaster assistance from multiple state and federal programs for an individual who needs assistance as a result of a disaster; (2) an automated intake system for collecting the information; and (3) a state case management system for disaster assistance, administered by the commission, that is similar to the Federal Emergency Management Agency case management system and includes contracting with nonprofit vendors to hire caseworkers and provide case management services. (c) The commission and the division shall coordinate with the Federal Emergency Management Agency and other appropriate state and federal agencies to conduct the study under Subsection (b) of this section. The commission and the division must determine: (1) whether the Federal Emergency Management Agency and other appropriate state and federal agencies will accept the single intake form; (2) the cost of developing the single intake form and the cost of developing and maintaining the automated intake system; and (3) the cost of developing and maintaining a state case management system and the extent to which federal reimbursement is available. (d) Not later than September 1, 2020, the commission and the division shall prepare and submit a written report to the legislature containing the findings of the study conducted under Subsection (b) of this section and any recommendations to the legislature. (e) The commission and the division may implement the single intake form, automated intake system, and state case management system if the commission and the division determine, based on the study conducted under Subsection (b) of this section, that doing so will result in no additional cost to the state. SECTION 2. This Act expires January 1, 2021. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *