Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2363 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Harris, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 2363
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019;
 May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2363 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to permitting certain foster homes to store firearms and
 ammunition in the same locked location.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.042(e-1), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e-1)  The commission [department] may not prohibit
 possession of lawfully permitted firearms and ammunition in an
 agency foster home. Minimum standards may be adopted under this
 section relating to safety and proper storage of firearms and
 ammunition. The minimum standards must allow [, including
 standards requiring] firearms and ammunition to be stored
 separately or stored together in the same locked location if the
 firearms are stored with a trigger locking device attached to the
 firearms [locations].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *