Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2364 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Darby, Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2364
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of certain services through statewide
 technology centers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2054.376, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), this subchapter
 applies to electronic messaging service and outsourced managed
 services that are:
 (1)  obtained by a state agency using state money;
 (2)  used by a state agency; or
 (3)  used by a participating local government.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *