Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2365 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2365
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information required to be published with a notice of
 intent to apply for the passage of a local or special law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 313.002(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The notice is sufficient if it contains a statement of
 the general purpose and substance of the intended law and the name
 of the person paying for the publication. Publication of the
 particular form of the intended law or the terms used in the
 intended law is not required.
 SECTION 2.  Section 313.006(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The notice is sufficient if it contains a statement of
 the general purpose and substance of the intended law and the name
 of the person paying for the publication. Notice of the particular
 form of the intended law or the terms used in the intended law is not
 required.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *