Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2425 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2019

                    By: Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2425
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of physicians to delegate to certain
 pharmacists the implementation and modification of a patient's drug
 therapy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 157.101, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b-1) and adding Subsection (g) to read as
 follows:
 (b-1)  A delegation under Subsection (b) may include the
 implementation or modification of a patient's drug therapy under a
 protocol, including the authority to sign a prescription drug order
 for dangerous drugs, if:
 (1)  the delegation follows a diagnosis, initial
 patient assessment, and drug therapy order by the physician;
 (2)  the pharmacist practices in a federally qualified
 health center, a hospital, a hospital-based clinic, or an academic
 health care institution;
 (3)  the federally qualified health center, hospital,
 hospital-based clinic, or academic health care institution in which
 the pharmacist practices has bylaws and a medical staff policy that
 permit a physician to delegate to a pharmacist the management of a
 patient's drug therapy;
 (4)  the pharmacist provides the name, address, and
 telephone number of the pharmacist and of the delegating physician
 on each prescription signed by the pharmacist; and
 (5)  the pharmacist provides a copy of the protocol to
 the Texas State Board of Pharmacy.
 (g)  In this section, "federally qualified health center"
 has the meaning assigned by Section 531.02192, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *