Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2439 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2019

                    By: Phelan, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 2439
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019;
 May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain regulations adopted by governmental entities
 for the building products, materials, or methods used in the
 construction or renovation of residential or commercial buildings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 10, Government Code, is amended by adding
 Subtitle Z to read as follows:
 SUBTITLE Z. MISCELLANEOUS PROVISIONS PROHIBITING CERTAIN
 GOVERNMENTAL ACTIONS
 CHAPTER 3000. GOVERNMENTAL ACTION AFFECTING RESIDENTIAL AND
 COMMERCIAL CONSTRUCTION
 Sec. 3000.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "National model code" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 214.217, Local Government Code.
 (2)  "Governmental entity" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 2007.002.
 Sec. 3000.002.  CERTAIN REGULATIONS REGARDING BUILDING
 PRODUCTS, MATERIALS, OR METHODS PROHIBITED.  (a)  Notwithstanding
 any other law and except as provided by Subsection (d), a
 governmental entity may not adopt or enforce a rule, charter
 provision, ordinance, order, building code, or other regulation
 that:
 (1)  prohibits or limits, directly or indirectly, the
 use or installation of a building product or material in the
 construction, renovation, maintenance, or other alteration of a
 residential or commercial building if the building product or
 material is approved for use by a national model code published
 within the last three code cycles that applies to the construction,
 renovation, maintenance, or other alteration of the building; or
 (2)  establishes a standard for a building product,
 material, or aesthetic method in construction, renovation,
 maintenance, or other alteration of a residential or commercial
 building if the standard is more stringent than a standard for the
 product, material, or aesthetic method under a national model code
 published within the last three code cycles that applies to the
 construction, renovation, maintenance, or other alteration of the
 building.
 (b)  A governmental entity that adopts a building code
 governing the construction, renovation, maintenance, or other
 alteration of a residential or commercial building may amend a
 provision of the building code to conform to local concerns if the
 amendment does not conflict with Subsection (a).
 (c)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  a program established by a state agency that
 requires particular standards, incentives, or financing
 arrangements in order to comply with requirements of a state or
 federal funding source or housing program;
 (2)  a requirement for a building necessary to consider
 the building eligible for windstorm and hail insurance coverage
 under Chapter 2210, Insurance Code;
 (3)  an ordinance or other regulation that:
 (A)  regulates outdoor lighting for the purpose of
 reducing light pollution; and
 (B)  is adopted by a governmental entity that is
 certified as a Dark Sky Community by the International Dark-Sky
 Association as part of the International Dark Sky Places Program;
 (4)  an ordinance or order that:
 (A)  regulates outdoor lighting; and
 (B)  is adopted under Subchapter B, Chapter 229,
 Local Government Code, or Subchapter B, Chapter 240, Local
 Government Code;
 (5)  a building located in a place or area designated
 for its historical, cultural, or architectural importance and
 significance that a municipality may regulate under Section
 211.003(b), Local Government Code, if the municipality:
 (A)  is a certified local government under the
 National Historic Preservation Act (54 U.S.C. Section 300101 et
 seq.); or
 (B)  has an applicable landmark ordinance that
 meets the requirements under the certified local government program
 as determined by the Texas Historical Commission;
 (6)  a building located in a place or area designated
 for its historical, cultural, or architectural importance and
 significance by a governmental entity, if designated before April
 1, 2019;
 (7)  a building located in an area designated as a
 historic district on the National Register of Historic Places;
 (8)  a building designated as a Recorded Texas Historic
 Landmark;
 (9)  a building designated as a State Archeological
 Landmark or State Antiquities Landmark;
 (10)  a building listed on the National Register of
 Historic Places or designated as a landmark by a governmental
 entity;
 (11)  a building located in a World Heritage Buffer
 Zone; and
 (12)  a building located in an area designated for
 development, restoration, or preservation in a main street city
 under the main street program established under Section 442.014.
 (d)  A municipality that is not a municipality described by
 Subsection (c)(3)(A) or (B) may adopt or enforce a regulation
 described by Subsection (a) that applies to a building located in a
 place or area designated on or after April 1, 2019, by the
 municipality for its historical, cultural, or architectural
 importance and significance, if the municipality has the voluntary
 consent from the building owner.
 (e)  A rule, charter provision, ordinance, order, building
 code, or other regulation adopted by a governmental entity that
 conflicts with this section is void.
 Sec. 3000.003.  INJUNCTION. (a) The attorney general or an
 aggrieved party may file an action in district court to enjoin a
 violation or threatened violation of Section 3000.002.
 (b)  The court may grant appropriate relief.
 (c)  The attorney general may recover reasonable attorney's
 fees and costs incurred in bringing an action under this section.
 (d)  Sovereign and governmental immunity to suit is waived
 and abolished only to the extent necessary to enforce this chapter.
 Sec. 3000.004.  OTHER PROVISIONS NOT AFFECTED.  This chapter
 does not affect provisions regarding the installation of a fire
 sprinkler protection system under Section 1301.551(i), Occupations
 Code, or Section 775.045(a)(1), Health and Safety Code.
 Sec. 3000.005.  SEVERABILITY. If any provision of a rule,
 charter provision, ordinance, order, building code, or other
 regulation described by Section 3000.002(a) is held invalid under
 this chapter, the invalidity does not affect other provisions or
 applications of the rule, charter provision, ordinance, order,
 building code, or other regulation that can be given effect without
 the invalid provision or application, and to this end the
 provisions of the rule, charter provision, ordinance, order,
 building code, or other regulation are severable.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *