Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2464 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2019

                    86R17893 SOS-D
 By: Hernandez H.B. No. 2464
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2464:
 By:  Hernandez C.S.H.B. No. 2464


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of massage schools and the issuance of a
 permit to massage school students; requiring an occupational
 permit; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.053, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 455.053.  RULES REGARDING MASSAGE SCHOOLS. (a) Rules
 adopted under this chapter relating to a massage school must
 contain minimum standards for:
 (1)  the issuance, denial, renewal, suspension,
 revocation, or probation of a license under this chapter;
 (2)  the qualifications of professional personnel;
 (3)  the supervision of professional personnel;
 (4)  the equipment essential to the education, health,
 and safety of students, massage school personnel, and the public;
 (5)  the sanitary and hygienic conditions of a massage
 school;
 (6)  the provision of massage therapy or other massage
 services by a massage school or student;
 (7)  the maximum number of hours a student may
 accumulate in a massage school's internship program before the
 student is required to be licensed under this chapter;
 (8)  the educational and clinical records kept by a
 massage school;
 (9)  the organizational structure of a massage school,
 including the lines of authority and the delegation of
 responsibility;
 (10)  fire prevention and safety in a massage school;
 (11)  the massage school's curriculum and educational
 material;
 (12)  massage school inspections; and
 (13)  any other aspect of the operation of a massage
 school that the commission considers necessary to protect students,
 massage school personnel, or the public.
 (b)  The commission may adopt rules to:
 (1)  authorize a massage school to account for any
 hours of instruction completed under this chapter on the basis of
 clock hours or course hours; and
 (2)  establish standards for determining the
 equivalency and conversion of clock hours to course hours and
 course hours to clock hours.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 455.151, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.151.  LICENSE OR PERMIT REQUIRED.
 SECTION 3.  Section 455.151(b), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Unless the person is exempt from the licensing
 requirement, a person may not represent that the person is a massage
 therapist, massage school, massage therapy instructor, or massage
 establishment unless the person holds an appropriate license under
 this chapter. A person may not represent that the person is a
 massage student unless the person holds a student permit issued
 under Section 455.1581.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 455, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 455.1581 to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.1581.  STUDENT PERMIT. (a) The department shall
 require a student to hold a student permit if the student is
 enrolled in a massage school in this state.
 (b)  The department shall issue a student permit to an
 applicant who:
 (1)  submits an application to the department for a
 student permit in the form prescribed by the department;
 (2)  satisfies other requirements specified by the
 department; and
 (3)  pays the application fee set by the commission.
 (c)  The permit must:
 (1)  state the student's name; and
 (2)  state the name of the school in which the student
 is enrolled.
 (d)  A student permit holder who provides massage therapy as
 part of the course of instruction required for a massage therapist
 license:
 (1)  is exempt from licensing under this chapter; and
 (2)  may not be compensated for providing massage
 therapy.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter E, Chapter 455, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 455.2031 and 455.2032 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 455.2031.  DAILY ATTENDANCE RECORDS. (a) A massage
 school shall maintain an attendance record of the students' daily
 attendance in a manner prescribed by the department.
 (b)  The department may inspect a school's attendance record
 at any time.
 Sec. 455.2032.  REPORTS TO DEPARTMENT. (a) A massage school
 shall maintain a monthly progress report regarding each student
 attending the school. The report must certify the daily attendance
 record of each student and the number of course hours and internship
 hours earned by each student during the previous month.
 (b)  On a student's completion of a prescribed course of
 instruction, a massage school shall notify the department that the
 student has completed the required number of hours.
 (c)  On completion of the required number of hours, the
 department shall determine whether a student is eligible to take
 the appropriate examination.
 SECTION 6.  The heading to Section 455.204, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.204.  DISPLAY OF LICENSE OR PERMIT.
 SECTION 7.  Sections 455.204(a) and (c), Occupations Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who holds a license or student permit shall
 publicly display the license or permit, as applicable, as specified
 by the department.
 (c)  Each massage school, massage student, massage
 establishment, massage therapy instructor, or massage therapist
 shall present the person's license or student permit, as
 applicable, on the request of the department, an authorized
 representative of the department, or a peace officer.
 SECTION 8.  Section 455.158, Occupations Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 9.  (a) Not later than March 1, 2020, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation and the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation, as appropriate, shall adopt any rules or
 forms necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act to
 Chapter 455, Occupations Code.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 455.151, Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act, Section 455.1581, Occupations Code, as added
 by this Act, Section 455.204, Occupations Code, as amended by this
 Act, and the repeal by this Act of Section 455.158, Occupations
 Code, a student enrolled in a massage school in this state is not
 required to comply with the changes in law made by this Act until
 June 1, 2020.
 (c)  A massage school shall submit the first monthly report
 and the first notice of student completion required under Section
 455.2032, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 July 1, 2020.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.