Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2471 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2019

                    By: Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2471
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating the week that includes the third Saturday
 in October as Veterinary Technician Week.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.157 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.157.  VETERINARY TECHNICIAN WEEK. The week that
 includes the third Saturday in October is Veterinary Technician
 Week in recognition of the critical role veterinary technicians
 play in the day-to-day functions of veterinary practices and for
 their vital role in preserving animal health and welfare.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *