Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2474 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    86R21406 KFF-F
 By: Guillen H.B. No. 2474
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2474:
 By:  Hinojosa C.S.H.B. No. 2474


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of medical assistance for certain
 individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 32.0256, Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0256.  CONTINUATION OF MEDICAL ASSISTANCE FOR
 CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS; ANNUAL REPORT. (a) A recipient [described by
 Section 32.025(a)] who experiences an event or circumstance,
 including a temporary increase in income of a duration of one month
 or less or a minor technical or clerical error committed on or with
 respect to the recipient's renewal application or other document
 required for benefits renewal, that would normally result in the
 recipient being determined ineligible for medical assistance
 continues to be eligible for that assistance if the individual:
 (1)  either:
 (A)  receives services through one of the
 following programs that serve [a program for] individuals with an
 intellectual or developmental disability [authorized] under
 Section 1915(c), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1396n(c)):
 (i)  the home and community-based services
 (HCS) waiver program; or
 (ii)  the Texas home living (TxHmL) waiver
 program; or
 (B)  resides in an ICF-IID facility; and
 (2)  continues to meet the functional and diagnostic
 criteria for the receipt of services under a program described by
 Subdivision (1)(A) or for residency in an ICF-IID facility.
 (b)  To continue to be eligible for medical assistance, a
 recipient described by Subsection (a) who is determined ineligible
 for medical assistance because of an event or circumstance caused
 wholly by the action or inaction of the recipient or the recipient's
 parent or guardian must submit an application for medical
 assistance in accordance with Section 32.025(b) not later than the
 90th day after the date on which the recipient is determined
 ineligible.
 (c)  The commission may not suspend or terminate the
 eligibility of a recipient for medical assistance benefits if the
 recipient's ineligibility is caused partly or wholly by a technical
 or clerical error committed by the commission or an agent of the
 commission.
 (d)  The commission shall:
 (1)  coordinate with and inform relevant health care
 providers if a recipient described by Subsection (a) is at risk of
 being determined ineligible for medical assistance benefits or is
 determined ineligible for those benefits; and
 (2)  make reasonable efforts to ensure the medical
 assistance benefits of a recipient described by Subsection (a) are
 not suspended or terminated.
 (e)  Not later than December 31 of each year, the commission
 shall prepare and submit a report to the legislature regarding the
 suspension or termination of medical assistance benefits of
 recipients described by Subsection (a) that occurred during the
 preceding state fiscal year. The report must include:
 (1)  the number of recipients who are living in a
 community-based, residential setting whose eligibility for
 benefits was suspended or terminated during each month of the
 fiscal year;
 (2)  if the commission reinstated the benefits of a
 recipient, the average, median, shortest, and longest length of
 time the commission took to reinstate those benefits;
 (3)  the number of recipients whose benefits were not
 reinstated by the commission;
 (4)  the specific reason for the suspension or
 termination of benefits of a recipient, including an analysis of
 the percentage of suspensions or terminations related to:
 (A)  an increase in the recipient's income;
 (B)  a failure by the recipient or the recipient's
 parent or guardian to properly submit a renewal application or
 other document required for benefits renewal;
 (C)  a change in the recipient's condition that
 results in the recipient no longer meeting the functional or
 diagnostic criteria necessary to establish the recipient's
 eligibility for services under a program described by Subsection
 (a)(1)(A) or for residency in an ICF-IID facility;
 (D)  a technical or clerical error committed by
 the commission or an agent of the commission; and
 (E)  any other reason that occurs with enough
 frequency to warrant its inclusion in the analysis, as determined
 by the commission; and
 (5)  a statement of the amount of retroactive
 reimbursements paid to health care providers for the provision of
 services to a recipient during the time the recipient's eligibility
 for benefits was suspended or terminated.
 SECTION 2.  Section 3, Chapter 1072 (H.B. 3292), Acts of the
 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 32.0256(e), Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services
 Commission shall ensure that the initial report required under that
 subsection includes a description of the number of recipients
 described by Section 32.0256(a), Human Resources Code, as amended
 by this Act, who are living in a community-based, residential
 setting and whose eligibility for benefits was suspended or
 terminated during each month of the state fiscal years ending
 August 31, 2016, August 31, 2017, and August 31, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.