Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2475 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2475
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the indigent status of a person for purposes of the
 driver responsibility program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 708.158, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A person may provide information to the court, as
 described by Subsection (b), to establish that the person is
 indigent at any time during a period the person is enrolled in an
 installment plan under Section 708.153.
 SECTION 2.  Section 708.158(c), Transportation Code, as
 added by this Act, applies to any surcharge pending on the effective
 date of this Act, regardless of whether the surcharge was imposed
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *