Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB25 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: González of El Paso, et al. H.B. No. 25
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini, Miles)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 25 By:  Miles


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot program for providing services to certain women
 and children under the Medicaid medical transportation program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.024141 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.024141.  PILOT PROGRAM FOR PROVIDING MEDICAL
 TRANSPORTATION PROGRAM SERVICES TO PREGNANT WOMEN AND NEW MOTHERS.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Demand response transportation services" means
 medical transportation program services that are provided by
 dispatching a transportation service provider's vehicle in
 response to a request from a client or by a shared one-way trip.
 (2)  "Managed transportation organization" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 533.00257.
 (3)  "Medicaid managed care organization" means a
 managed care organization as defined by Section 533.001 that
 contracts with the commission under Chapter 533 to provide health
 care services to Medicaid recipients.
 (4)  "Medical transportation program" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 531.02414.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the Maternal
 Mortality and Morbidity Task Force established under Chapter 34,
 Health and Safety Code, shall develop and, not later than September
 1, 2020, implement a pilot program in at least one health care
 service region, as defined by Section 533.001, that allows for a
 managed transportation organization that participates in the pilot
 program to arrange for and provide medical transportation program
 services to:
 (1)  a woman who is enrolled in the STAR Medicaid
 managed care program during the woman's pregnancy and after she
 delivers; and
 (2)  the child of a woman described by Subdivision (1)
 who accompanies the woman.
 (c)  A managed transportation organization that participates
 in the pilot program shall:
 (1)  arrange for and provide the medical transportation
 program services described by Subsection (b) in a manner that does
 not result in additional costs to Medicaid or the commission;
 (2)  arrange for and provide demand response
 transportation services, including, to the extent allowed by law,
 through a transportation network company as defined by Section
 2402.001, Occupations Code, to a woman described by Subsection (b)
 if:
 (A)  the request for transportation services is
 made during a period of time determined by commission rules before
 the woman requires transportation in order to receive a covered
 health care service; or
 (B)  the woman receiving medical transportation
 program services needs to travel directly to and from a location to
 receive a covered health care service and cannot be a participant in
 a shared trip; and
 (3)  ensure that the managed transportation
 organization and the managed care organization through which a
 woman described by Subsection (b) receives health care services
 effectively share information and coordinate services for the
 woman.
 (d)  In developing the pilot program, the commission shall
 ensure that a managed transportation organization participating in
 the pilot program provides medical transportation services in a
 safe and efficient manner.
 (e)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the commission shall
 report to the legislature on the implementation of the pilot
 program.
 (f)  The commission shall evaluate the results of the pilot
 program and determine whether the program:
 (1)  is cost-effective;
 (2)  improves the efficiency and quality of services
 provided under the medical transportation program; and
 (3)  is effective in:
 (A)  increasing access to prenatal and postpartum
 health care services;
 (B)  reducing pregnancy-related complications;
 and
 (C)  decreasing the rate of missed appointments
 for covered health care services by women enrolled in the STAR
 Medicaid managed care program.
 (g)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the commission shall
 submit a report to the legislature on the results of the pilot
 program. The commission shall include in the report a
 recommendation regarding whether the pilot program should
 continue, be expanded, or terminate.
 (h)  The executive commissioner:
 (1)  shall adopt rules specifying the number of days or
 hours before transportation services are needed that a request for
 the services must be made for purposes of Subsection (c)(2)(A); and
 (2)  may adopt other rules to implement this section.
 (i)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *