Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2502 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Moody, Wilson (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2502
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 9, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a mandatory term of confinement for defendants placed
 on community supervision for the criminal offense of leaving the
 scene of a motor vehicle accident resulting in the death of a
 person.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter K, Chapter 42A, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 42A.515 to read as follows:
 Art. 42A.515.  COMMUNITY SUPERVISION FOR LEAVING SCENE OF
 MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT RESULTING IN DEATH OF PERSON. (a)  A judge
 granting community supervision to a defendant convicted of an
 offense punishable under Section 550.021(c)(1)(A), Transportation
 Code, shall require as a condition of community supervision that
 the defendant submit to a term of confinement of not less than 120
 days.
 (b)  If a sentence of confinement is imposed on the
 revocation of community supervision, the term of confinement served
 under Subsection (a) may not be credited toward completion of the
 sentence imposed.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *