Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2530 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Flynn (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2530
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development by the Texas Veterans Commission of an
 online repository of information of use to active duty military
 relocating to this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.026.  ONLINE REPOSITORY FOR ACTIVE DUTY MILITARY.
 (a)  The Texas Veterans Commission shall develop and maintain on the
 state electronic Internet portal project described by Section
 2054.252 an online repository of information of use to active duty
 members of the United States armed forces and their families
 relocating to this state.
 (b)  The repository under Subsection (a) must include
 information on assistance, fee waivers, and programs the state
 provides to active duty members of the United States armed forces
 and their families related to occupational and professional
 licenses, education, and health care.
 (c)  A link to the repository developed under Subsection (a)
 must be prominently displayed on the public home page of the state
 electronic Internet portal project described by Section 2054.252.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *