Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2540 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2019

                    86R13994 JON-D
 By: Meza H.B. No. 2540


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report on the prevalence of dyslexia and illiteracy
 among incarcerated persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 501.0052 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.0052.  REPORT ON INCIDENCE OF DYSLEXIA AND
 ILLITERACY AMONG INCARCERATED PERSONS. (a) Not later than
 September 1, 2020, the department shall identify each dyslexic
 inmate housed in facilities operated by the division.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the department shall
 use the information obtained under Subsection (a) and Section
 501.005(c) to prepare a written report providing statistical
 information regarding the incidence of dyslexia and functional
 illiteracy among incarcerated persons in this state. The report
 must include the findings and legislative recommendations of the
 department.
 (c)  The department shall submit the report to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and
 chair of each legislative standing committee having jurisdiction
 over corrections.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.