Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2541 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2019

                    86R12948 JON-D
 By: Meza H.B. No. 2541


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of no-knock entries conducted in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.055.  NO-KNOCK ENTRY REPORT. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Law enforcement agency" has the meaning assigned
 by Article 59.01, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (2)  "No-knock entry" means a peace officer's entry,
 for the purpose of executing a warrant, into a building or other
 place without giving notice of the officer's authority or purpose
 before entering.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2020, a law enforcement
 agency that executes a no-knock entry shall submit a report to the
 director, on a form provided by the department, providing the
 following information for the period beginning on October 1, 2019,
 and ending on November 1, 2020:
 (1)  the number of no-knock entries executed by the law
 enforcement agency; and
 (2)  for each no-knock entry executed:
 (A)  whether one or more officers were injured or
 died as a result of the entry, with a description of each type of
 injury sustained by an officer and the cause of death of each
 officer who died;
 (B)  whether one or more occupants were injured or
 died as a result of the entry, with a description of each type of
 injury sustained by an occupant and the cause of death of each
 occupant who died;
 (C)  the criminal activity described in the
 warrant authorizing the entry that the law enforcement agency:
 (i)  suspected was being conducted inside
 the place entered; or
 (ii)  accused an occupant of the place of
 having conducted;
 (D)  a description of any evidence sought by the
 warrant authorizing the entry and a description of any evidence
 obtained; and
 (E)  the identity of any individual sought by the
 warrant authorizing the entry and the identity of any individual
 arrested.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2021, the director shall
 compile the reports received under Subsection (b) and provide a
 report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the
 legislature. The report must contain the following information
 regarding no-knock entries for the previous calendar year:
 (1)  the number executed by each law enforcement
 agency;
 (2)  statistics analyzing the number of injuries or
 deaths sustained by officers or occupants;
 (3)  for no-knock entries executed for the purpose of
 obtaining evidence, the proportion of those entries where the
 evidence described by the warrant authorizing the entry was
 obtained;
 (4)  for no-knock entries executed for the purpose of
 arresting an individual, the proportion of those entries where the
 individual described by the warrant authorizing the entry was
 arrested; and
 (5)  the proportion of violent crimes to nonviolent or
 drug-related offenses for which no-knock entries were executed.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2019, the director shall
 promulgate the form required under Subsection (b).
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.