Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2571 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Toth, Metcalf (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2571
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Interstate Highway 45 in
 Montgomery County as the George P. Mitchell Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  GEORGE P. MITCHELL MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.  (a)  The
 portion of Interstate Highway 45 in Montgomery County between its
 intersection with State Highway 242 and the Montgomery-Harris
 county line is designated as the George P. Mitchell Memorial
 Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the George P. Mitchell Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *