Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2617 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2019

                    By: Cole (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 2617
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the fiscal year of certain political subdivisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 140, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 140.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 140.012.  FISCAL YEAR OF CERTAIN POLITICAL SUBDIVISIONS
 CREATED ON OR AFTER SEPTEMBER 1, 2019.  (a)  This section does not
 apply to a political subdivision that is a special district created
 under Section 52, Article III, or Section 59, Article XVI, Texas
 Constitution.
 (b)  A political subdivision that is created on or after
 September 1, 2019, and that has authority to impose a tax must have
 the same fiscal year as the county in which the political
 subdivision is wholly or primarily located.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *