Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2618 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2019

                    86R10459 JG-F
 By: Walle H.B. No. 2618


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maternal peer support pilot program for perinatal
 mood disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. MATERNAL PEER SUPPORT PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 32.101.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "pilot
 program" means the maternal peer support pilot program established
 under this subchapter.
 Sec. 32.102.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The
 commission shall establish and operate the maternal peer support
 pilot program to reduce the risk and manage the effects of perinatal
 mood disorders in women through the delivery of peer support
 services at federally qualified health centers located in the
 geographic areas in which the pilot program operates.
 (b)  The commission shall establish the pilot program in
 three counties in this state that:
 (1)  either:
 (A)  are within an area designated as a mental
 health professional shortage area; or
 (B)  have high rates of maternal mortality and
 morbidity as determined by the commission in consultation with the
 Maternal Mortality and Morbidity Task Force established under
 Chapter 34; and
 (2)  include at least one rural county and one county
 with a population of at least one million.
 Sec. 32.103.  OPERATION OF PILOT PROGRAM. (a) In
 establishing the pilot program, the commission shall:
 (1)  develop a strategy for federally qualified health
 centers participating in the pilot program and persons responsible
 for training to collaborate on the training, certification, and
 guidance of peer support specialists;
 (2)  seek comments regarding best practices for the
 design and implementation of the pilot program from relevant
 interested persons, including mental health care providers, local
 mental health authorities, certified peer support specialists and
 affiliated organizations, women's health care providers, and
 individuals who have personal experience with perinatal mood
 disorders;
 (3)  develop specialized training to:
 (A)  identify and treat symptoms of perinatal mood
 disorders; and
 (B)  provide peer support services to pregnant
 women and new mothers;
 (4)  develop a strategy for peer support specialists
 participating in the pilot program to provide peer support services
 through telemedicine or telehealth services;
 (5)  collaborate with federally qualified health
 centers participating in the pilot program to integrate the
 delivery of peer support services with the health care services
 provided by the centers to women during pregnancy and within one
 year of giving birth;
 (6)  create a protocol for referring to peer support
 services women who are diagnosed as having or identified as being at
 risk of developing a perinatal mood disorder;
 (7)  ensure that services provided by peer support
 specialists under the pilot program are within the scope of a
 practice of care prescribed by commission rule for peer support
 specialists who provide similar services; and
 (8)  develop a method for collecting data on:
 (A)  maternal health and mental health outcomes;
 and
 (B)  substance use by women receiving peer support
 services through the pilot program.
 (b)  A peer support specialist who provides peer support
 services through the pilot program shall:
 (1)  provide peer support services to women who:
 (A)  based on the results of a postpartum
 depression screening or other screening tool, are diagnosed as
 having or identified as being at risk of developing a perinatal mood
 disorder; and
 (B)  are interested in receiving peer support
 services; and
 (2)  through the use of the specialist's personal
 experience with perinatal mood disorders:
 (A)  provide guidance to the women;
 (B)  if necessary, advocate for the women to
 receive mental health care services or other specialized health
 care services; and
 (C)  provide the women with information on mental
 health care resources as necessary.
 Sec. 32.104.  FUNDING. In addition to money appropriated by
 the legislature, the commission may accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any source for the purpose of establishing the pilot
 program and compensating peer support specialists under the pilot
 program.
 Sec. 32.105.  REPORT. Not later than January 1, 2021, the
 commission shall prepare and submit to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, and legislature a written report that:
 (1)  evaluates the success of the pilot program in
 reducing perinatal mood disorders and substance use in women who
 received peer support services under the pilot program; and
 (2)  recommends whether the pilot program should be
 continued, expanded, or terminated.
 Sec. 32.106.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires September 1,
 2023.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 31, 2019, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall adopt rules as necessary to establish the pilot program as
 required by Subchapter E, Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than June 31, 2020, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall establish the pilot program as required
 by Subchapter E, Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.