Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2628 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Vo (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2628
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019;
 May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2628 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the manner of reporting and maintaining certain
 information relating to candidates and election returns.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 67.007(a), (c), and (d), Election Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For each election for a statewide, [or] district,
 county, or precinct office, a statewide measure, or president and
 vice-president of the United States, the county clerk of each
 county in the territory covered by the election shall prepare
 county election returns.
 (c)  The county clerk shall certify [sign] the county returns
 [to certify their accuracy].
 (d)  Not later than 24 hours after completion of the local
 canvass, the county clerk shall deliver to the secretary of state,
 in the manner directed by the secretary, the county returns [in a
 sealed envelope]. [The envelope shall be labeled: "Election
 Returns for __________ (name) County, for __________(election)."]
 SECTION 2.  Sections 67.008(b) and (c), Election Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The returns shall be delivered to the secretary of state
 as provided by Section 67.007. [, except that the envelope shall be
 labeled: "Returns of Election for Governor/Lieutenant Governor,
 __________ (name) County, for __________(election)."]
 (c)  The secretary of state shall retain the returns [in
 their sealed condition] until the first day of the next regular
 legislative session, when the secretary shall deliver the returns
 to the speaker of the house of representatives.
 SECTION 3.  Section 67.009(b), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  With the delivery of the official county returns forms,
 the secretary of state shall deliver[:
 [(1)]  written instructions on the preparation and
 delivery of the county election returns[; and
 [(2)     the officially prescribed envelopes for
 delivering the returns to the secretary].
 SECTION 4.  Section 181.032, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Not later than the 10th day after the date of the filing
 deadline prescribed by Section 181.033, the authority with whom an
 application is filed shall deliver to the secretary of state a list
 containing:
 (1)  each candidate's name;
 (2)  each candidate's residence address;
 (3)  the office sought by the candidate; [and]
 (4)  the date on which the candidate filed the
 application; and
 (5)  any additional information required by the
 secretary of state.
 (c)  A list delivered under Subsection (b) must be in a
 format prescribed by the secretary of state.
 SECTION 5.  Section 181.068(a), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The presiding officer of each convention held under this
 chapter shall certify, in a format prescribed by the secretary of
 state, [writing] for placement on the general election ballot the
 name and address of each candidate nominated by the convention.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *