Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2641 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Darby, Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2641
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; April 24, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the release of a reversionary interest in certain real
 property by the Health and Human Services Commission and conditions
 related to that release.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) Subject to Subsections (b) and (c) of this
 section and not later than February 1, 2021, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall execute an appropriate instrument to
 release and nullify the right of reverter to which the real property
 described by Section 2 of this Act is subject under the deed filed
 in the Deed Records of Howard County, Texas, at Volume 795, Pages
 141-143.
 (b)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall by
 appropriate instrument release the right of reverter described by
 Subsection (a) of this section only if:
 (1)  the West Texas Centers for Mental Health and
 Mental Retardation transfers by appropriate instrument of
 conveyance to Cap Rock Holdings, LLC, a Texas limited liability
 company, real property described by Section 2 of this Act in
 exchange for the real property described by Section 3 of this Act
 transferred by appropriate instrument of conveyance by Cap Rock
 Holdings, LLC, a Texas limited liability company, to West Texas
 Centers for Mental Health and Mental Retardation;
 (2)  the fair market value of the real property
 described by Section 3 of this Act is equal to or greater than the
 fair market value of the real property described by Section 2 of
 this Act as established by an independent appraisal obtained by the
 asset management division of the General Land Office; and
 (3)  the real property described by Section 3 of this
 Act is conveyed to the West Texas Centers for Mental Health and
 Mental Retardation by Cap Rock Holdings, LLC, a Texas limited
 liability company, by appropriate instrument of conveyance that
 includes a provision that imposes as a condition on title to the
 real property that the title will automatically vest in the Health
 and Human Services Commission if the West Texas Centers for Mental
 Health and Mental Retardation discontinues using the property for
 the purpose of providing community-based mental health and
 intellectual disability services for more than 180 continuous days.
 (c)  The Health and Human Services Commission may execute the
 instrument releasing the right of reverter described by Subsection
 (a) of this section to nullify the right of reverter and clear the
 right of reverter from the title of the real property described by
 Section 2 of this Act only if the General Land Office has verified
 that the conditions described by Subsection (b) of this section
 have been satisfied.
 SECTION 2.  The real property title to which is held by the
 West Texas Centers for Mental Health and Mental Retardation is
 situated in Howard County, Texas, and more particularly described
 as follows:
 Lots 5, 6 and 7, Block 19, Original Town Site, Big Spring, Howard
 County, Texas and further described as being a +/- 0.48-acre tract
 in a deed to the State recorded at Volume 642, Page 480, of the Deed
 Records of Howard County, Texas.
 SECTION 3.  The real property title to which is held by Cap
 Rock Holdings, LLC, a Texas limited liability company, is situated
 in Howard County, Texas, and more particularly described as
 follows:
 400 Nolan, Big Spring, TX
 Acres 0.257, LT 1 & N/30 of LT 2 BK 31 Original Town 80X140 0535 ACQ
 062211 BLK/TRACT 31 0.257 acres
 401 Johnson (7-11) Big Spring, TX
 Acre 0.321, Lts 11-12 Blk 31 Original Town 100x140 0545 Blk/Tract 31
 0.321 acres
 Store #508
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *