Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2659 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2659
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of names by public insurance adjusters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4102.162, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 4102.162.  USE OF DIFFERENT NAME PROHIBITED. A license
 holder may not use a name different from the name under which the
 license holder is currently licensed in an advertisement,
 solicitation, or contract for business unless the name is used
 under a valid assumed name certificate as provided by Chapter 71,
 Business & Commerce Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *