Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2709 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2709
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2019;
 April 9, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorization for the sale of certain Texas Tech
 University property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 109.054, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 109.054.  MANAGEMENT OF LANDS. The board has the sole
 and exclusive management and control of lands set aside and
 appropriated to or acquired by the institutions under its
 governance.  The board may lease, sell, exchange, acquire, dispose
 of, and otherwise manage, control, and use the lands in any manner
 and at prices and under terms and conditions the board deems best
 for the interest of the institutions. [However, the board may not
 sell any of the original main campus of Texas Tech University
 located in Lubbock, Lubbock County, unless the sale is approved by
 act of the legislature.]  No grazing lease shall be made for a
 period of more than five years.
 SECTION 2.  Section 109.0541, Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *